U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00671-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LOLLIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 15, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • February 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 17, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 10, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Submission to the Court in Preparation for Upcoming Plea Hearing]
  • November 22, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • November 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • November 22, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • November 22, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 18, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 15, 2021: [Standing Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 15, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.