U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00662-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PEART
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Transcript]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • June 04, 2022: [Travel ]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • May 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 02, 2022: [Sentencing]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 10, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • February 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 12, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • January 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 12, 2022: [Waiver]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 03, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 03, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 16, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.