U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00668-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CHAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util- Jury Verdict]
  • January 24, 2023: [Attorneys' Acknowledgment of Trial Exhibits]
  • January 24, 2023: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 24, 2023: [Exhibit List ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • January 22, 2023: [Exhibit List ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Exhibit List ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Witness List]
  • January 20, 2023: [Trial Brief ]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • November 22, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 02, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Discovery]
  • November 02, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Exclude]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 23, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 14, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 13, 2021: [Protective Order ]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 17, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 16, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.