U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00669-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SORGENTE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 08, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Reply in Support]
  • October 03, 2024: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • October 03, 2024: [Hearing ]
  • October 02, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Errata]
  • September 29, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 27, 2024: [Response to motion]
  • September 27, 2024: [In Limine ]
  • September 27, 2024: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • September 27, 2024: [Change Venue]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Transcript]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 08, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Modifying Conditions of Release]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 01, 2022: [Status Conference]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 30, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 30, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 29, 2021: [Status Report]
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order]
  • November 24, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 17, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 16, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.