U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00676-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CHAPMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • May 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 17, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • May 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Vacate]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 16, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 16, 2021: [Deferred of PSI Report]
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 07, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 07, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 07, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • December 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 17, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.