U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00673-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MARVIN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 23, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 20, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 16, 2022: [Sealed Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Sentencing]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • November 30, 2022: [Downward Departure]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 13, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • November 12, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • November 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Vacate]
  • August 26, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Status Conference]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Status Report]
  • January 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 05, 2022: [Vacate]
  • January 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2021: [Vacate]
  • December 20, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 09, 2021: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • December 09, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 09, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 09, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 09, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 09, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 09, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 17, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.