U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00677-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ROMERO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • August 11, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 18, 2022: [Downward Departure]
  • July 15, 2022: [Travel ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 18, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • March 18, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • March 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • March 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Travel ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 01, 2022: [Status Conference]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Travel ]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 29, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 29, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • November 29, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 29, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.