U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00679-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DENNIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Transcript]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Transcript]
  • January 13, 2023: [Exhibit List ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order Modifying Conditions of Release]
  • January 13, 2023: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • January 13, 2023: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • January 11, 2023: [Trial Brief ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • January 09, 2023: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • January 05, 2023: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 03, 2023: [Trial Brief ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • December 03, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • November 21, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Change of Venue]
  • November 09, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • November 08, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Suppress]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2022: [Response to motion]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • October 27, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 14, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • October 14, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • October 13, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • October 13, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • October 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2022
  • July 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 09, 2022: [Status Conference]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 29, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 29, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 23, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2021: [Indictment]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.