U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00678-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NIX
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • December 16, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 16, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 13, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 02, 2022: [Exclude]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Exclude]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Exclude]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • May 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 03, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 07, 2022: [Status Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 22, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 03, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • November 30, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • November 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • November 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 27, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 27, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 27, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 27, 2021: [Exclude]
  • November 22, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 19, 2021: [Standing Order]
  • November 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.