U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00688-1
  • Case Name: USA v. IRAVANI
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Probation Order]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Travel ]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Return of Passport]
  • July 06, 2022: [Return of Passport ]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 21, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • June 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 16, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Travel ]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • December 22, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Travel ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 30, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 29, 2021: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • November 29, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 29, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • November 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 29, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 29, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • November 24, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 19, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.