U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00684-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LASTER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • May 05, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 29, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • February 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 02, 2022: [Return of Property/PostTrial]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 20, 2022: [Factual Proffer]
  • January 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 18, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • December 01, 2021: [Protective Order ]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 24, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 24, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 24, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 24, 2021: [Stay]
  • November 24, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2021: [Review]
  • November 20, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 19, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • November 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.