U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00687-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RHINE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Change of Venue]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • January 24, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Supplement to any document]
  • January 23, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 18, 2023: [Suppress]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • December 07, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 07, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 07, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • November 23, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • November 16, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • October 17, 2022: [Suppress]
  • October 17, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • October 17, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • August 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 18, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 12, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • May 09, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 10, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Disclosure ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 22, 2021: [Standing Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 21, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 21, 2021: [Exclude]
  • November 21, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 19, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.