U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00661-1
  • Case Name: USA v. THOMAS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • November 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 27, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 27, 2021: [Exclude]
  • November 27, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • November 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 24, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 24, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • November 24, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 24, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 24, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.