U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00682-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WEISBECKER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • October 12, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • September 15, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • September 06, 2022: [Probation Order]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • July 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Return of Passport]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • July 12, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • July 11, 2022: [Clarify]
  • July 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 08, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • July 06, 2022: [Return of Passport ]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • March 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 03, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • March 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • March 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 04, 2022: [.Order]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 31, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 31, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2021: [Exclude]
  • December 07, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 01, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 29, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • November 29, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 19, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.