U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00685-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FORTINEAU
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Transcript]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • June 01, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 27, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 27, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • January 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 27, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Protective Order ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 29, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • November 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 19, 2021: [Indictment]
  • November 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 19, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 19, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 19, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.