U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00691-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MANLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • December 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 08, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • December 08, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Response to motion]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 18, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • July 18, 2022: [Change Venue]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Proposed Order]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 31, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • January 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • January 14, 2022: [Revoke]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 05, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Disclosure ]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • December 27, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 27, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 21, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • December 21, 2021: [Hearing ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice of Proposed Order]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • December 20, 2021: [Hearing ]
  • December 19, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 17, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.