U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00692-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FASSELL et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • December 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 13, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 13, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • August 16, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • July 19, 2022: [Statement of Facts in Support of Plea Agreement ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 19, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 19, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • July 19, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • July 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • May 04, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • April 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 20, 2022: [Bond ]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 17, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 17, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Disclosure ]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 19, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.