U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00693-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KULAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • May 05, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice of Courtroom Change]
  • February 23, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • December 06, 2021: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • December 06, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order for Routine Processing]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 06, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 22, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 22, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.