U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00690-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GRILLO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 27, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 27, 2024: [Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • July 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Exclude]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Status Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 03, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 03, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.