U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00689-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HAMNER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Leave to File Review]
  • April 25, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Transcript]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Convert Hearing]
  • November 14, 2022: [Exclude]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Status Report]
  • October 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Exclude]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Exclude]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 26, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 19, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • July 05, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • July 01, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
June, 2022
  • June 20, 2022: [Revoke]
  • June 17, 2022: [Status Report]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 18, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • May 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • May 18, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 15, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 21, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.