U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00686-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ENTREKIN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Access]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 25, 2022: [Access]
  • May 11, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • May 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 06, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 14, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • January 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order]
  • December 30, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 30, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 10, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 08, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 08, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Standing Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.