U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00666-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FLOYD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • January 18, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 17, 2023: [Transcript]
  • January 12, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 11, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • January 05, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 04, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 04, 2022: [Add Counts]
  • October 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 04, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 12, 2022: [Exclude]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 08, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 19, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • May 15, 2022: [Vacate]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 08, 2022: [Leave to File Denied]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 05, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Protective Order ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 29, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 24, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 24, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 24, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 24, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 24, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • November 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 21, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.