U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00694-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PRENZLIN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 05, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • July 01, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Error]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • March 25, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • March 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • March 25, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • March 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 25, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 10, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • March 09, 2022: [Information - Felony]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 22, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 06, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 06, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 03, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 02, 2021: [Exclude]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.