U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00656-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BILYARD
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 17, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 14, 2021: [Supplement to any document]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order]
  • December 10, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 05, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 01, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2021: [Exclude]
  • December 01, 2021: [.Order]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 23, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.