U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00617-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BUSTOS et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 12, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 03, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 03, 2021: [CJA 7 - Order Terminating Counsel ]
  • December 03, 2021: [.Order]
November, 2021
  • November 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 27, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 27, 2021: [Exclude]
  • November 27, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.