U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00672-1
  • Case Name: USA v. OGBENNA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 25, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Proposed Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 27, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • June 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • June 27, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 16, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Exclude]
  • May 23, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Exclude]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 07, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 23, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 23, 2021: [Exclude]
  • November 23, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 23, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 23, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.