U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00644-3
  • Case Name: USA v. PURDY et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
December, 2021
  • December 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 02, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 02, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 02, 2021: [Exclude]
  • December 02, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 24, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 24, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.