U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00145
  • Case Name: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION v. NEXWAY, INC.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Stipulation]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 06, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 25, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 24, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 24, 2021: [Application for Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.