U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00657-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HOMER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 21, 2022: [Exclude]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 11, 2022: [Exclude]
  • April 06, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 18, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • March 15, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 07, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 04, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 12, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 10, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 29, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • November 29, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.