U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00696-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CARICO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • June 06, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • March 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 11, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 21, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 21, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 05, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 29, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.