U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00661-2
  • Case Name: USA v. YOUNG-BEY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply in Support]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • March 28, 2025: [Reconsideration ]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Leave to Join]
  • January 17, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 13, 2023: [Sever Defendant]
  • January 13, 2023: [Bill of Particulars ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • January 13, 2023: [Dismiss Case]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 28, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 14, 2022: [.Order]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [.Order]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 13, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 30, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 30, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 30, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 30, 2021: [Exclude]
  • November 30, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 29, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 29, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.