U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00698-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GLEFFE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Courtroom Change]
  • December 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 11, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • September 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 08, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • September 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Exclude]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Exclude]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Status Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 10, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 10, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 03, 2021: [Standing Order]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 30, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 30, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.