U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00697-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WESTOVER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • April 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 11, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 08, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • April 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Courtroom Change]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 07, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 06, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 06, 2021: [Arraignment]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 30, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.