U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00650-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TEW
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 19, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 08, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 01, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 01, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.