U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00701-1
  • Case Name: USA v. THOMAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Probation Order]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • October 25, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 05, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • June 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • June 01, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Status Report]
  • March 03, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 20, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 20, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 20, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 01, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 01, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.