U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00703-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CHANG
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Status Report]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Status Report Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [Status Report]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Status Report]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 09, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 09, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 03, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 03, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 02, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.