U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00665-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MYERS et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 08, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Protective Order ]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 09, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 09, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 02, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 02, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.