U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00654-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MACANDREW
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 09, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 09, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 02, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 02, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.