U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00704-1
  • Case Name: USA v. O'MALLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Transcript]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Access]
  • October 13, 2022: [Access]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • April 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 07, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Permit]
  • January 05, 2022: [Permit]
December, 2021
  • December 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 29, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 15, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • December 15, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 15, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 03, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 03, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 02, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.