U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00675-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MALIK
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • December 10, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 10, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 03, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
  • December 03, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Arrest - Rule 5]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.