U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00707-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MITCHELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 10, 2021: [Probation Order]
  • December 03, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.