U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00671-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PANAYIOTOU
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 07, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 09, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 09, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 03, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 03, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • December 02, 2021: [Seal Case]
  • December 02, 2021: [Complaint (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.