U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00668-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SHAW
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • January 02, 2022: [Protective Order]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 23, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 16, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 16, 2021: [Exclude]
  • December 16, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 13, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 03, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 03, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.