U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00702-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BAQUERO et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 19, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 08, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 08, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 03, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.