U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00678-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SMITH
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • February 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Exclude]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Exclude]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 13, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 08, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.