U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00237-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PIERCE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • October 09, 2024: [Transfer Out/Supervised]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.