U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00711-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LIU
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [Status Report]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 20, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 20, 2022: [Deferred of PSI Report]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • July 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Exclude]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Exclude]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Modifying Conditions of Release]
  • February 18, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 17, 2022: [Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 16, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 08, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 06, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.