U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00710-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCCORMICK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • January 17, 2023: [Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 20, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 13, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone]
  • November 10, 2022: [Appear by Telephone]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 14, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • September 14, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • September 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 14, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 04, 2022: [Arraignment]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [.Order]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 16, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 16, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • December 10, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 07, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 07, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.