U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00709-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CAO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Leave to File Review]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 09, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • November 09, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • November 09, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • November 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Travel ]
  • September 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • September 07, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 19, 2022: [Protective Order ]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 24, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 24, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • June 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Status Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 28, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 16, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • December 16, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 06, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 06, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.