U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00708-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KELLY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Order to Show Cause ]
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Leave to File Document ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 02, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 20, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 15, 2022: [Suppress]
  • November 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • November 15, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • November 15, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Change Venue]
September, 2022
  • September 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 11, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 09, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 14, 2021: [Hearing ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Exclude]
  • December 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 07, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.